Senevirathna, Adithyapala Sisira (CPSO#: 89952)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Colombo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009