Seneviratne Atapattu, Yasanthie Shobamanie (CPSO#: 89394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kathmandu University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stroud Medical Centre
Suite 1
7869 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: (705) 436-7991
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

31 health Services Centre Borden
O-166, 30 Route Ortona Road
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Canada
Phone: 705-424-1200 Ext. 1292
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. S. Seneviratne Atapattu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Seneviratne Atapattu ( CPSO# 89394 )

Business Address:
31 Health Services Centre
30 Ortona Road
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 424-1200

Business Address:
Stroud Medical Centre
1 - 7869 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASANTHIE SHOBAMANIE SENEVIRATNE ATAPATTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENEVIRATNE ATAPATTU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010