Sengar, Pankaj Singh (CPSO#: 81733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Dec 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
Oshawa Clinic
1300 Keith Ross Drive
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6153
Fax: (905) 721-6671
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-6153
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pankaj S. Sengar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sengar ( CPSO# 81733 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
Oshawa Clinic
2nd Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6153

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 4, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Pankaj Singh Sengar,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sengar to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sengar may not practice thoracic surgery unless he obtains
                  certification with the Royal College in thoracic surgery.  For greater
                  certainty, Dr. Sengar may practice general surgery, exclusive of major
                  surgical techniques reserved solely for thoracic surgery.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)