Seong, Augene (CPSO#: 95290)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Augene Seong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2017