Sepehr Arae, Arash (CPSO#: 76670)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: Sepehr-Arae, Arash (used until: 21 Dec 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2008