Seppala, Nicholas Harry (CPSO#: 93328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Place & District Memorial
Hospital
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place, ON
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone: 613-257-2200
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Seppala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Seppala ( CPSO# 93328 )

Business Address:
Meno-Ya-Win Health Center
Sioux Lookout-Department of Radiology
P.O. Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 251-9644

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HARRY SEPPALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEPPALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015