Sequeira, Errol Joseph (CPSO#: 64093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10443 Highway 27
Vaughan
Woodbridge ON  L0J 1C0
Canada
Phone: (289) 202-2222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10260 Kennedy Rd North
Brampton ON  L6T 3S1
Canada
Phone: (905) 495-4695
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

4350 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON  L5M 7C8
Canada
Phone: (905) 812-1175
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1060 Eglinton Ave
Mississauga ON  L4W 1K3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sequeira ( CPSO# 64093 )

Business Address:
1060 Eglinton Avenue Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1K3
Phone Number: (905) 624-1511

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Business Address:
4350 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 7C8
Phone Number: (905) 812-1175

Business Address:
10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6T 3S1
Phone Number: (905) 495-4695

Business Address:
7891 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H8
Phone Number: (905) 459-4904

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERROL JOSEPH SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992