Serb, Abdusalam Milod (CPSO#: 83616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St John Regional Hospital
400 University Avenue
St John NB  E2L 3L6
Phone: (506) 648-6713
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44697
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Abdusalam Serb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Serb ( CPSO# 83616 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
400 University Avenue
St. John NB  E2L 4L4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUSALAM MILOD SERB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012