Serio, Damiano (CPSO#: 104093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2950 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E7
Phone: 416-438-6633
Fax: 416-438-3633
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Serio ( CPSO# 104093)

Business Address:
2950 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 438-6633

Business Address:
Suite 205
1920 Ellesmere Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (647) 336-2753

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Aug 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAMIANO SERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2017 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 May 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2017