Seron, Giselle (CPSO#: 88050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: Lawrence-Patel, Giselle Mary Teresa (used until: 17 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Square One Medical Mgt Corp
Units 1 and 2
4175 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0H1
Phone: (905) 848-4880
Fax: (905) 848-4882
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giselle Lawrence-Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 16 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Giselle Seron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Seron ( CPSO# 88050 )

Business Address:
Dr Giselles Medical Centre
Units 1 & 2
4175 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0H1
Phone Number: (905) 848-4880

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GISELLE SERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2009