Seth, Neena Kishori (CPSO#: 72853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2018

Expiry Date:  23 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 25 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEENA KISHORI SETH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SETH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SETH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SETH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SETH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SETH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SETH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 23 Nov 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 22 Aug 2018 to 23 Nov 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018