Seth, Puneet (CPSO#: 90639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3rd Floor, 100 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 546-9885
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 546-9885
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 7C7

Business Address:
3rd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571


Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3

Business Address:
210 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Business Address:
Suite M14
414 Victoria Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8

Business Address:
Suite 305
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNEET SETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011