Sethi, Berjinder Jay (CPSO#: 94897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: Sethi, Berjinder (used until: 30 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MedSleep
Suite 205
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: 905-636-9772
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Mental Health Association
HKPR
415 Water Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 3L9
Canada
Phone: 705-748-6687
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

MedSleep Pembroke
715 MacKay Street, Ground Floor
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-735-2358
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

East GTA Family Health Team
520 Ellesmere Road, 6th floor
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Canada
Phone: 647-693-7401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berjinder Jay Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sethi ( CPSO# 94897 )

Business Address:
415 Water Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 3L9
Phone Number: (705) 748-6687

Business Address:
6th Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (647) 529-2259

Business Address:
Suite 205
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 636-9772

Business Address:
715 MacKay Street
Ground Floor
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 735-2358

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERJINDER JAY SETHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012