Sethi, Monica (CPSO#: 89715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Summerville Family
Medicine Teaching Unit 7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sethi ( CPSO# 89715 )

Business Address:
Trillium Summerville Family
Medicine Teaching Unit
Unit 700
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA SETHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010