Sethi, Vineeta (CPSO#: 92752)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Christian Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2014