Setterfield, Jeremy George (CPSO#: 97834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
308-201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: 613 732 3675 Ext. 6652
Fax: 613 732 2089
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Setterfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Setterfield ( CPSO# 97834 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Urology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Business Address:
308 - 201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY GEORGE SETTERFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETTERFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017