Setty, Yatish Nonavinakere (CPSO#: 77043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 233
10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone: (519) 371-1278
Fax: (519) 371-4718
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 07 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
               Dr.  Yatish  Nonavinakere  Setty  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            rheumatology, only.