Sextus, Raji (CPSO#: 113905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus Family Health Team
Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJI SEXTUS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SEXTUS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. SEXTUS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEXTUS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SEXTUS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SEXTUS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SEXTUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019