Seyed Akhavan, Pooneh (CPSO#: 80322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2-029
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4810
Fax: (416) 586-8766
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Genesis Health
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farshid Tabloie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tabloie ( CPSO# 79733 )
Dr. P. Seyed Akhavan ( CPSO# 80322 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
7 - 2535 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 303-0760

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-2911

Business Address:
Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Medical & Surgical Centre
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POONEH SEYED AKHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYED AKHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006