Sfeir, Frederic (CPSO#: 93702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 789-4385
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERIC SFEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SFEIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015