Shadbolt, Nicole Stephanie (CPSO#: 86368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE STEPHANIE SHADBOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHADBOLT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010