Shadd, Joshua David (CPSO#: 73517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Peter's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
88 Maplewood Ave, Room 124
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 12311
Fax: 519-545-0822
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joshua Shadd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shadd ( CPSO# 73517 )

Business Address:
St. Peter's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
124 - 88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA DAVID SHADD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHADD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005