Shadrina, Anna Georgiyivna (CPSO#: 83167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:National Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road, room 3348
Ottawa
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3080
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.G. Shadrina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shadrina ( CPSO# 83167 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Room 3348
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA GEORGIYIVNA SHADRINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHADRINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011