Shah, Alia (CPSO#: 92443)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2010 to 01 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010