Shah, Hemant Ashok (CPSO#: 79465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9E N-220
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4946
Fax: (416) 340-4280
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hemant Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sood ( CPSO# 82984 )
Dr. H. Shah ( CPSO# 79465 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 9EN-220
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4946


Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Sood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sood ( CPSO# 82984 )
Dr. H. Shah ( CPSO# 79465 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Sciences Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMANT ASHOK SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007