Shah, Parag Kirit (CPSO#: 80267)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Saurashtra University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2003 to 10 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Dec 2003 to 14 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2004