Shah, Prakeshkumar Shantilal (CPSO#: 73197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19 231P
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4761
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Avenue
Division of Neonatology
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shah ( CPSO# 76006 )
Dr. P. Shah ( CPSO# 73197 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue Suite 19-231P
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4761

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRAKESHKUMAR SHANTILAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004