Shah, Sachin Jaydie (CPSO#: 92623)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 09 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2014