Shahein, Abdul Rahman Hussein Ismail Hassan (CPSO#: 90025)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 15 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2009 to 22 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2009 to 29 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012