Shahi, Sundeep (CPSO#: 76337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sundeep Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahi ( CPSO# 76337 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 23 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011