Shahid, Kainat (CPSO#: 91058)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital, 200 Elizabeth Street, Toronto, ON, M5G 2C4
Date Received: 12 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2016