Shahideh, Mehdi (CPSO#: 88517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 134
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 279-3533
Fax: (905) 615-0492
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Shahideh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shahideh ( CPSO# 88517 )

Business Address:
134 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 279-3533

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHDI SHAHIDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIDEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014