Shahin, Ilan (CPSO#: 95402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 929-1900
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

365 West. St.
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: 519-426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAN SHAHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013