Shahparaki, Aram (CPSO#: 71243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Shore Multispecialty Clinic
1881 Marine Drive
North Vancouver BC  V7P 1V5
Phone: (604) 770-4264
Fax: (604) 770-4265

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARAM SHAHPARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHPARAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2006