Shahriaree, Pegah (CPSO#: 83088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pegah Shahriaree Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shahriaree ( CPSO# 83088 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEGAH SHAHRIAREE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHRIAREE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2010