Shaikh, Naureen Azhar (CPSO#: 94504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Medical
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton Family care centre
& Walk in Clinic
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: (905) 864-9393
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naureen A. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shaikh ( CPSO# 94504 )

Business Address:
Upper Appleby Medical
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 315-9929

Business Address:
Milton Family Care Centre and Walk In Clinic
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAUREEN AZHAR SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2012 to 15 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012