Shaikh, Vaquas Mohammad (CPSO#: 93532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Physicians
Brampton Civic Hospital (WOHS)
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58097
Fax: (905) 494-6571
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vaquas M. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shaikh ( CPSO# 93532 )

Business Address:
Emergency Physicians
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VAQUAS MOHAMMAD SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013