Shakerinia, Tooraj (CPSO#: 81511)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 603 - 100 Arden St Moncton, NB E1C 4B7
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018