Shamon, Sandy Danyal (CPSO#: 96025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Assyrian, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2N3
Phone: (519) 622-7800
Fax: (519) 622-7178
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 George St South
Cambridge ON  N1S2N3
Canada
Phone: (519) 622-7800
Fax: (519) 622-7178
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. D. Shamon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shamon ( CPSO# 96025 )

Business Address:
11 George Street South
Cambridge ON  N1S 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 622-7800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDY DANYAL SHAMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013