Shamoon, Rita (CPSO#: 92835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-2930 Dominion Blvd
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone: 226-773-8070
Fax: 226-773-8071
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rita Shamoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shamoon ( CPSO# 92835 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone Number: (226) 773-8070

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA SHAMOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012