Shamrani, Hanan Mohammed Ali A (CPSO#: 78539)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005