Shamseddin, Mohammad Khaled (CPSO#: 87605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 1234
Fax: (613) 548-2524
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Khaled Shamseddin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamseddin ( CPSO# 87605 )

Business Address:
Queens University Kingston Gen Hosp
Department of Medicine Nephrology
Burr 3 038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KHALED SHAMSEDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSEDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2010