Shamy, Michel Christopher Frank (CPSO#: 84769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2182a
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4709
Fax: (613) 761-5360
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL CHRISTOPHER FRANK SHAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013