Shan, Xi (CPSO#: 75197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 453-0715
Fax: (905) 453-0972
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
L6R 3J7
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Steet
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 34567
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xi Shan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shan ( CPSO# 75197 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 453-0715

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XI SHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004