Shankar, Jai Jai Shiva (CPSO#: 87938)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ranchi University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2007 to 16 Jan 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2008 to 06 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2009 to 06 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010