Shanmugalingam, Arany (CPSO#: 91313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arany Shanmugalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugalingam ( CPSO# 91313 )

Business Address:
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARANY SHANMUGALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014