Shanmugarajah, Gnanaraj (CPSO#: 89211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

8787 Woodbine Avenue Unit 118
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Canada
Phone: 18883150663
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Shanmugarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shanmugarajah ( CPSO# 89211 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GNANARAJ SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011