Shannon, Michael Austin (CPSO#: 58048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Pine St
suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 571-1200
Fax: (519) 571-8050
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Shannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shannon ( CPSO# 58048 )

Business Address:
201 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 571-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL AUSTIN SHANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988