Shanthanna, Harsha (CPSO#: 91661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harsha Shanthanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shanthanna ( CPSO# 91661 )

Business Address:
HHS McMaster University
Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Harsha Shanthanna may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. Shanthanna holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Shanthanna
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.