Shapiro, Joel Arthur (CPSO#: 86561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapiro ( CPSO# 86561 )

Business Address:
Unit 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Phone Number: (416) 229-2399

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL ARTHUR SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012